TX SB331 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to designating certain synthetic cannabinoids as controlled substances under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; providing penalties and establishing certain criminal consequences or procedures.
Title
Relating to designating certain synthetic cannabinoids as controlled substances under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; providing penalties and establishing certain criminal consequences or procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-16 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-12 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-09 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-07 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-30 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-21 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-01-12 | Filed | |
2011-01-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |