TX SB329 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to birth records of adopted persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to birth records of adopted persons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-12-15SenateFiled
2016-12-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback