TX SB327 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to including certain veterans service organizations as small businesses for the purpose of state contracting.
Title
Relating to including certain veterans service organizations as small businesses for the purpose of state contracting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-11 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-01-10 | Filed | |
2011-01-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Military & Veterans
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Military & Veterans
Purchasing
Purchasing--State