TX SB326 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the amount of wine certain wineries may sell directly to consumers.
Title
Relating to the amount of wine certain wineries may sell directly to consumers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |