TX SB323 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the offense of female genital mutilation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the offense of female genital mutilation.


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-04-25SenateRead first time
2017-04-25SenatePermission to introduce
2017-04-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments