TX SB321 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the River Ranch Municipal Utility District of Liberty County and the Riverside Municipal Utility District of Liberty County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the River Ranch Municipal Utility District of Liberty County and the Riverside Municipal Utility District of Liberty County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2017-05-29 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
RIVER RANCH MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF LIBERTY COUNTY
RIVERSIDE MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF LIBERTY COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
RIVERSIDE MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF LIBERTY COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility