TX SB321 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an employee's transportation and storage of certain firearms or ammunition while on certain property owned or controlled by the employee's employer.
Title
Relating to an employee's transportation and storage of certain firearms or ammunition while on certain property owned or controlled by the employee's employer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-27 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-26 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-26 | Record vote | |
2011-05-26 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-26 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-24 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-20 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-20 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-19 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-19 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-17 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-17 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-17 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-17 | Read | |
2011-05-17 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-04 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-04 | Record vote | |
2011-05-04 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-04 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-04 | Record vote | |
2011-05-04 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-04 | Amended | |
2011-05-04 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-03 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Point of order overruled | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-03 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-16 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-15 | Record vote | |
2011-03-15 | Passed | |
2011-03-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-15 | Record vote | |
2011-03-15 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-15 | Record vote | |
2011-03-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Record vote | |
2011-03-15 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-15 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-15 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-14 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-08 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-07 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-01-24 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-01-07 | Filed | |
2011-01-07 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Labor
Labor--General
Labor--Management Relations
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Weapons
Labor
Labor--General
Labor--Management Relations
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Weapons