TX SB317 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the taking of feral hogs without a hunting license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the taking of feral hogs without a hunting license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-31 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-07HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-07SenateFiled
2019-01-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3550 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback