TX SB313 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the State Board of Dental Examiners; imposing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the State Board of Dental Examiners; imposing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1320 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 See remarks for effective date
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-22SenateRead
2017-05-22SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HousePassed
2017-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-17HouseAmended
2017-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-17HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-04-17HouseRead first time
2017-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-11SenateRecord vote
2017-04-11SenatePassed
2017-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-11SenateRecord vote
2017-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-11SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-11SenateAmended
2017-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-11SenateAmended
2017-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-11SenateAmended
2017-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-11SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-03-07SenateRead first time
2017-03-06SenateFiled
2017-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback