TX SB313 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the required public school curriculum, the administration of and reports relating to assessment instruments administered to public school students, the instructional materials allotment, and proclamations for the production of instructional materials.
Title
Relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the required public school curriculum, the administration of and reports relating to assessment instruments administered to public school students, the instructional materials allotment, and proclamations for the production of instructional materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - SB 313Third Reading House (Y: 86 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - SB 313Third Reading House (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - SB 313Third Reading House (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-31 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
FOUNDATION SCHOOL FUND
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
FOUNDATION SCHOOL FUND