TX SB308 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the powers and duties of campus police departments at private institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the powers and duties of campus police departments at private institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - House - SB 308Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-01 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-20SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-20SenateHouse passage reported
2015-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-19HouseRecord vote
2015-05-19HousePassed
2015-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-05-15HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-05-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-05HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-23HouseReferred to Higher Education
2015-04-23HouseRead first time
2015-03-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-03-25SenateReported engrossed
2015-03-25SenateRecord vote
2015-03-25SenatePassed
2015-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-25SenateRecord vote
2015-03-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-03-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-03-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-03-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-03SenateCo-author authorized
2015-02-02SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2015-02-02SenateRead first time
2015-01-15SenateFiled
2015-01-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback