TX SB306 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release by a peace officer of certain individuals suspected of the offense of public intoxication.
Title
Relating to the release by a peace officer of certain individuals suspected of the offense of public intoxication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Effective immediately | |
2019-04-25 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-04-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#320 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 830 |
2019-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB818 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety