TX SB30 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the removal of certain discriminatory provisions from a recorded conveyance instrument.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the removal of certain discriminatory provisions from a recorded conveyance instrument.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1424 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1414 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28SenateRecord vote
2021-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-28SenateRead
2021-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1424
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1414
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24HouseAmended 2-Leach
2021-05-24HouseAmended 1-Leach
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-04-07HouseRead first time
2021-04-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-31SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenatePassed
2021-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-24SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-03-08SenateFiled
2021-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB222 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB30
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00030I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00030S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00030E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00030H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00030F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00030H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00030H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00030I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00030I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00030E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00030H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00030H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00030F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00030F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-31-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB30&RcdVtNo=1414&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB30&RcdVtNo=1424&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=93

Bill Comments 750

feedback