TX SB30 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inclusion of instruction regarding interaction with peace officers in the required curriculum for certain public school students and in driver education courses and to civilian interaction training for peace officers.
Title
Relating to inclusion of instruction regarding interaction with peace officers in the required curriculum for certain public school students and in driver education courses and to civilian interaction training for peace officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1964 (Y: 129 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1416 (Y: 109 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1416 (Y: 109 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Driver Education & Training
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PEACE OFFICERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Driver Education & Training
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PEACE OFFICERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road