TX SB3 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring public school students to compete in interscholastic athletic competitions based on biological sex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring public school students to compete in interscholastic athletic competitions based on biological sex.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-04SenateCo-author authorized
2021-09-27HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-09-27HouseRead first time
2021-09-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-09-22SenateReported engrossed
2021-09-22SenateRecord vote
2021-09-22SenatePassed
2021-09-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-09-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-09-22SenateRecord vote
2021-09-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-09-22SenateRecord vote
2021-09-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-09-22SenateOrdered not printed
2021-09-22SenatePrinting rule suspended
2021-09-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-09-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-09-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-09-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-09-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-09-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-09-20SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-09-20SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-09-20SenateRead first time
2021-09-20SenateFiled
2021-09-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB10 (Same As) 2021-09-27 - Referred to Public Education
HB25 (Similar To) 2021-10-16 - Senate Amendments Analysis distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback