TX SB3 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 10:00 am in E1.036 (Finance Room)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to additional funding to school districts for classroom teacher salaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to additional funding to school districts for classroom teacher salaries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2019-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-28SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-23SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-15SenateFiled
2019-01-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1371 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback