TX SB3 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of an education savings account program and a tax credit scholarship and educational expense assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of an education savings account program and a tax credit scholarship and educational expense assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Passed (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-04-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-30SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-30SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-03-30SenateRecord vote
2017-03-30SenatePassed
2017-03-30SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-30SenateRecord vote
2017-03-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-30SenateRecord vote
2017-03-30SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-30SenateRecord vote
2017-03-30SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2017-03-30SenateRecord vote
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment fails of adoption
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2017-03-30SenateVote reconsidered
2017-03-30SenateRecord vote
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-30SenateAmendment amended
2017-03-30SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-03-30SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-30SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-30SenateRecord vote
2017-03-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Education
2017-02-01SenateRead first time
2017-02-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateFiled
2017-01-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback