TX SB3 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public high school graduation, including curriculum and assessment requirements for graduation and funding in support of certain curriculum authorized for graduation.
Title
Relating to public high school graduation, including curriculum and assessment requirements for graduation and funding in support of certain curriculum authorized for graduation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Patrick [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ACADEMIC PERFORMANCE
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS