TX SB293 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a clarification of the law governing eligibility of certain events for funding under the Major Events trust fund.
Title
Relating to a clarification of the law governing eligibility of certain events for funding under the Major Events trust fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Rep. Jason Isaac [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Effective immediately | |
2015-04-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-04-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-31 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read |
2015-03-31 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-03-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed |
2015-03-30 | House | Point of order overruled |
2015-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-03-26 | House | Amended |
2015-03-26 | House | Point of order overruled |
2015-03-26 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-03-26 | House | Postponed |
2015-03-26 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2015-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General