TX SB290 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to including a personal financial literacy component in public school mathematics instruction.
Title
Relating to including a personal financial literacy component in public school mathematics instruction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-20 | Corrected comm. report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-17 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Education | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-12-21 | Filed | |
2010-12-21 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Financial
Financial--General
LITERACY
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Financial
Financial--General
LITERACY