TX SB28 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the approval of open-enrollment charter schools and the applicability of certain state and local laws to open-enrollment charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the approval of open-enrollment charter schools and the applicability of certain state and local laws to open-enrollment charter schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FA2 Hughes (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FA1 Bettencourt (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2021-05-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HousePosting rule suspended
2021-04-27HouseNo action taken in committee
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-04-19HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-15SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenatePassed as amended
2021-04-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15SenateAmended
2021-04-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 West
2021-04-15SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-14SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 West
2021-04-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14SenateAmended
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Lucio
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 West
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateAmended
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateAmended
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3279 (Same As) 2021-03-19 - Referred to Public Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB28
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00028I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00028S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00028E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00028S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00028S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00028S2F3.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00028S2F4.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00028S2F5.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00028S3F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00028I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00028I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00028S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00028S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00028E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=35
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=36
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=37
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=38
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments

feedback