TX SB28 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain governmental entities subject to the sunset review process.
Title
Relating to certain governmental entities subject to the sunset review process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-07 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-08-07 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Passed |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Point of order |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
MILITARY DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
MILITARY DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills