TX SB28 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the financing of ports in the state.
Title
Relating to the financing of ports in the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Mary Perez [D] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1268 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-17 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-16 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-16 | House | Passed |
2017-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to Texas Ports, Innovation & Infrastructure, Select |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF