TX SB277 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the eligibility of certain property for certain ad valorem tax incentives relating to wind-powered energy devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the eligibility of certain property for certain ad valorem tax incentives relating to wind-powered energy devices.


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1962 (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House grants request for conference committee RV#1929 (Y: 114 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1640 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1593 (Y: 76 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-08 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-08 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-26SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees w/inst-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees with instructions
2017-05-26HouseMotion prevails
2017-05-26HouseMotion to instruct conferees
2017-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed as amended
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-29SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-21SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-12-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB277&RcdVtNo=1593&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB277&RcdVtNo=1640&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB277&RcdVtNo=1929&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=23
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB277&RcdVtNo=1962&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=47

Bill Comments