TX SB273 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain offenses relating to carrying concealed handguns on property owned or leased by a governmental entity; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to certain offenses relating to carrying concealed handguns on property owned or leased by a governmental entity; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-23 - House - SB 273Third Reading House (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-23 | House | Passed |
2015-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Weapons
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Weapons