TX SB271 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of a citation or notice to appear for certain misdemeanors punishable by a fine only.
Title
Relating to the issuance of a citation or notice to appear for certain misdemeanors punishable by a fine only.
Sponsors
Sen. Konni Burton [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Donald Huffines [R] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MAGISTRATES
PEACE OFFICERS
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MAGISTRATES
PEACE OFFICERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB271 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00271I.htm |