TX SB270 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to newborn hearing screenings.
Title
Relating to newborn hearing screenings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-12 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-12 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-12-16 | Filed | |
2010-12-16 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUDIOLOGISTS
BIRTHING CENTERS
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HEARING DISORDERS
MIDWIVES & MIDWIFERY
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
BIRTHING CENTERS
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HEARING DISORDERS
MIDWIVES & MIDWIFERY
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety