TX SB27 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the mental health program for veterans and to the authority to establish a trauma affected veterans clinical care and research center at The University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the mental health program for veterans and to the authority to establish a trauma affected veterans clinical care and research center at The University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio.


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1985 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1332 (Y: 137 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-12HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-04-12HouseRead first time
2017-03-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-28SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-28SenateRecord vote
2017-03-28SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-28SenateRecord vote
2017-03-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-28SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-28-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB27&RcdVtNo=1332&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB27&RcdVtNo=1985&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=92

Bill Comments