TX SB266 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to notice required in connection with possessory liens on motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to notice required in connection with possessory liens on motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-17 Effective on 9/1/11
2011-06-17 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2011-05-26 Signed in the House
2011-05-25 Signed in the Senate
2011-05-23 Reported enrolled
2011-05-23 House passage reported
2011-05-23 Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2011-05-23 Record vote
2011-05-23 Passed
2011-05-23 Read 3rd time
2011-05-23 Record vote
2011-05-23 Constitutional three day rule suspended
2011-05-23 Passed to 3rd reading
2011-05-23 Read 2nd time
2011-05-23 Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2011-05-21 Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
2011-05-19 Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2011-05-18 Committee report distributed
2011-05-18 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2011-05-12 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2011-05-12 Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2011-05-12 Considered in formal meeting
2011-05-10 Left pending in committee
2011-05-10 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2011-05-10 Considered in public hearing
2011-05-10 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2011-04-28 Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2011-04-28 Read first time
2011-04-19 Received from the Senate
2011-04-18 Reported engrossed
2011-04-18 Record vote
2011-04-18 Passed
2011-04-18 Read 3rd time
2011-04-18 Record vote
2011-04-18 Three day rule suspended
2011-04-18 Vote recorded in Journal
2011-04-18 Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2011-04-18 Rules suspended-Regular order of business
2011-04-14 Placed on intent calendar
2011-04-13 Committee report printed and distributed
2011-04-13 Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
2011-04-13 Reported favorably as substituted
2011-04-11 Considered in public hearing
2011-04-06 Left pending in committee
2011-04-06 Testimony taken in committee
2011-04-06 Considered in public hearing
2011-04-06 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2011-01-31 Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
2011-01-31 Read first time
2010-12-15 Filed
2010-12-15 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback