TX SB263 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the revocation, suspension, or restriction of the license of a physician placed on deferred adjudication community supervision or arrested for certain offenses.
Title
Relating to the revocation, suspension, or restriction of the license of a physician placed on deferred adjudication community supervision or arrested for certain offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-27 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-26 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-24 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-24 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-23 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-23 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-23 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-23 | Read | |
2011-05-23 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-30 | Read first time | |
2011-03-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-17 | Record vote | |
2011-03-17 | Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-17 | Record vote | |
2011-03-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-12-15 | Filed | |
2010-12-15 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMMUNITY SERVICE
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
Health Care Providers
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
Health Care Providers
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS