TX SB26 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas emissions reduction plan and other related programs and measures to reduce emissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas emissions reduction plan and other related programs and measures to reduce emissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-03-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-14SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenatePassed
2017-03-14SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-14SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-14SenateAmended
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-14SenateAmended
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-14SenateAmended
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2017-01-18SenateFiled
2017-01-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback