TX SB2565 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to instructional material and technology, the adoption of essential knowledge and skills for certain public school foundation curriculum subjects, and creating allotments for the procurement of certain instructional materials under the Foundation School Program; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to instructional material and technology, the adoption of essential knowledge and skills for certain public school foundation curriculum subjects, and creating allotments for the procurement of certain instructional materials under the Foundation School Program; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-04-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA5 Creighton |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Creighton |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Creighton |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Creighton |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--Primary & Secondary--Textbooks
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
INTERNET
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--Primary & Secondary--Textbooks
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
INTERNET