TX SB256 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring a private autopsy facility to post a notice for filing a complaint against a physician; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to requiring a private autopsy facility to post a notice for filing a complaint against a physician; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan King [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-30 | Read first time | |
2011-03-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-12-10 | Filed | |
2010-12-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUTOPSIES
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
PUBLIC NOTICE
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
PUBLIC NOTICE