TX SB2553 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the regulatory authority of counties, including granting certain counties authority to regulate the cutting of certain trees; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulatory authority of counties, including granting certain counties authority to regulate the cutting of certain trees; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-15 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-15 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-15 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-15 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-15 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-04-23 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Permission to introduce | |
2009-04-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2874 (Similar To) 2009-04-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Subjects
BORDER
County Government
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Environment
Environment--General
County Government
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Environment
Environment--General