TX SB255 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contracts with and training for governmental entities and vendors, including purchasing and contract management training; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to contracts with and training for governmental entities and vendors, including purchasing and contract management training; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1724 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - RV#1723 (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1724 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - RV#1723 (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Governor
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Governor
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees