TX SB25 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to facilitate the transfer, academic progress, and timely graduation of students in public higher education.
Title
Relating to measures to facilitate the transfer, academic progress, and timely graduation of students in public higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1574 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1574 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1574 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | House | Amended 1-C. Turner |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 West |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB1787 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Higher Education
HB4018 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4018 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS