TX SB249 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the submission of an affordability and access report by public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the submission of an affordability and access report by public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenatePassed
2017-03-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-11-21SenateFiled
2016-11-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback