TX SB247 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to funding sources for the repayment of certain speech-language pathologist and audiologist education loans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to funding sources for the repayment of certain speech-language pathologist and audiologist education loans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-04SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-11-18SenateFiled
2016-11-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback