TX SB2437 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to the use by a metropolitan rapid transit authority of the construction manager-at-risk method for the construction, rehabilitation, alteration, or repair of a facility.
Title
Relating to the use by a metropolitan rapid transit authority of the construction manager-at-risk method for the construction, rehabilitation, alteration, or repair of a facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3057 (Same As) 2009-05-27 - Placed on intent calendar
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Political Subdivisions
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Political Subdivisions
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit