TX SB24 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 89-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a privilege from disclosure to governmental units for certain evidence concerning sermons delivered by a religious leader.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a privilege from disclosure to governmental units for certain evidence concerning sermons delivered by a religious leader.

Sponsors

Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]
Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Donald Huffines [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R]Sen. Royce West [D]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]
Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]
Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#986 (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Read 2nd time RV#872 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Effective immediately
2017-05-19 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-09HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-09SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-08SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-08SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-04-19HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-08SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-08SenateRecord vote
2017-03-08SenatePassed
2017-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-08SenateRecord vote
2017-03-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-08SenateRecord vote
2017-03-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-08SenateRules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
2017-03-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-02-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-02-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-02-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-31SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2017-01-17SenateCo-author authorized
2016-12-20SenateFiled
2016-12-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback