TX SB24 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training for members of the governing board of a public institution of higher education.
Title
Relating to training for members of the governing board of a public institution of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - SB 24Third Reading House (Y: 83 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - SB 24Third Reading House (Y: 82 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - SB 24Third Reading House (Y: 82 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 1/1/16 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed |
2015-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-20 | House | Amended |
2015-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Ethics
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Ethics
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS