TX SB239 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a parent's right to view the body of a deceased child before an autopsy is performed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a parent's right to view the body of a deceased child before an autopsy is performed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenatePassed
2017-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenateAmended
2017-04-20SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-11-16SenateFiled
2016-11-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback