TX SB239 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to student loan repayment assistance for certain mental health professionals.
Title
Relating to student loan repayment assistance for certain mental health professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - SB 239Third Reading House (Y: 81 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - SB 239Third Reading House (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - SB 239Third Reading House (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-03 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | House | Passed |
2015-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
PHYSICIANS
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
PSYCHOLOGISTS
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
STUDENT LOANS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
PHYSICIANS
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
PSYCHOLOGISTS
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
STUDENT LOANS