TX SB2381 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the places where certain knives are prohibited.
Title
Relating to the places where certain knives are prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2342 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars