TX SB237 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prohibition of employment discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Title
Relating to the prohibition of employment discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CIVIL RIGHTS DIVISION, TEXAS WORKFORCE COMMISSION
DISCRIMINATION
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
Human Relations
Labor
Labor--General
SEXUAL ORIENTATION
DISCRIMINATION
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
Human Relations
Labor
Labor--General
SEXUAL ORIENTATION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB237 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00237I.htm |