TX SB2352 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to marriage education courses for certain couples filing for divorce on the grounds of insupportability.
Title
Relating to marriage education courses for certain couples filing for divorce on the grounds of insupportability.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB480 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar