TX SB233 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to limitations on increases in fees and designated tuition charged by public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to limitations on increases in fees and designated tuition charged by public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Konni Burton [R] |
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Filed |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB233 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00233I.htm |