TX SB23 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring state contractors to participate in the federal electronic verification of employment authorization program, or E-verify.
Title
Relating to requiring state contractors to participate in the federal electronic verification of employment authorization program, or E-verify.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aliens
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
Labor
Labor--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
Labor
Labor--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees