TX SB23 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Summary
Relating to the period of continuous eligibility for the medical assistance program.
Title
Relating to the period of continuous eligibility for the medical assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-10 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB647 (Same As) 2009-03-19 - Left pending in committee
HB843 (Same As) 2009-03-19 - Left pending in committee
HB2199 (Same As) 2009-03-19 - Left pending in committee
HB2204 (Same As) 2009-03-19 - Left pending in committee
SB349 (Same As) 2009-02-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services
HB843 (Same As) 2009-03-19 - Left pending in committee
HB2199 (Same As) 2009-03-19 - Left pending in committee
HB2204 (Same As) 2009-03-19 - Left pending in committee
SB349 (Same As) 2009-02-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services