TX SB229 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to newborn hearing screenings and hearing services for certain children.
Title
Relating to newborn hearing screenings and hearing services for certain children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Read | |
2011-05-25 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-18 | Filed | |
2010-11-18 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BIRTHING CENTERS
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HEARING DISORDERS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HEARING DISORDERS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF